Trustees RUISLIP BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1132797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abel Zea Guierrez | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Jones | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Augustine George David Jones | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Wandia Corrado | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Yiqun Chong | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Temitope Tolulola Oshowole | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy Philip Bawden | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Barry Gerard Dore | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Anne Yarrow | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Erik Craig Rowland ACA | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN TUFT | Trustee | 28 November 1979 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DONAL INGRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM BAWDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN GARDNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA MARGARET DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.