ZIYARET TEPE ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST

Charity number: 1133366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.01k £20 £50 £50 £4
Total expenditure £25.66k £0 £2.00k £2.00k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A