Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER'S, DARWEN
Charity number: 1131646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alison Jane Mitchell | Chair | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Conley | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Stephen James Conley | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Jonathan Bent | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Claire Bent | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PICKUP | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ALEXANDER McLEOD | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Banks | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Brotherton | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE MARY COCKER | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Massey | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Leather | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
June Stewart | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Maria Jefferson | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
HENRY HASLEM GILBRAITH | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne Carus | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.