Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, BILTON
Charity number: 1137095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert LeMay | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pick | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Holton | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Price | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penny Street | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Stephenie Davison | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID POTTS | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Wendy Kay Brewer | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Assheton | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Helen Clark | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Kate Lover | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARION ELIZABETH AINSLOW | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev GLENN FREDERICK LOWDE | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE HOWES BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.