Governing document THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND (RUTLAND BRANCH)
Charity number: 500480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 31 APRIL 1970, 17 NOVEMBER 1970, 16 APRIL 1998, 13 JULY 2003 AND 22 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE IMPROVEMENT, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE COUNTRYSIDE OF RUTLAND AND ITS TOWNS AND VILLAGES AND THE BETTER DEVELOPMENT OF THE RURAL ENVIRONMENT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE COUNTRYSIDE OF RUTLAND AND ITS TOWNS AND VILLAGES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.