Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S WOOD, LONDON
Charity number: 1131882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashok Ghosh | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Mullins | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Marie Therese Reynier | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adesoye Braithwaite | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Millar | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Turner | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Lewis | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Young | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN NIGEL WILLIAM JONES | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kristina Andreasson | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDY FELICITY BOOTH | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anders Bergquist | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.