Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LOWER WHARFE
Charity number: 1131909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Margaret Hampson | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARY DAHLGREEN | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Robinson | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas John Morgan | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Ingram | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Kennedy | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Margaret Gibson | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW KEVAN SMITH | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Anne Palmer | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|||||
JILLIAN LAWSON | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|||||
DOREEN PATRICIA LISTER | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHIPS BROWNING | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV PATRICIA MARGARET ANSLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER LAWTON WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT FREDERICK BANKS WIVELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL BOWERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.