Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE'S, PARKSTONE
Charity number: 1134767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stuart John Cocksedge | Chair | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Louise Sturgess | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin George Counsell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Alison Lloyds | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Cullis | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret de Winton-Gilbert | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Murphy | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Justin George Blakeney Anson Coldstream | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Finch | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Melanie Hammond | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Roberts | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Giles | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carole Yvonne Schouten | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Holst | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Steve Blight | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL PATTISON | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Roger Michael Jones | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA ANN STACEY | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN HUDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.