Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE KIRKBY LONSDALE TEAM MINISTRY
Charity number: 1131834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Hall | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Paula Hall | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Joan Thornber | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Venys | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Anne Dehany | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan Cox | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||
WENDY ANN THORNTON | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
SUE O'LOUGHLIN | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN JAMES EVANS | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
MARY mCkENDRICK BLANCHARD | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Gillian Audrey Sykes | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Sue Sanderson | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ANNE ELIZABETH PETTIFOR | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN ANN FRY | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
ANNE FOULERTON | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Grace Lewis | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
LIZ DEW | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MERLIN ANDREW HIBBS | Trustee | 11 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
ARTHUR EDWARD OAKDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev RICHARD JOHN SNOW | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
CHARLES EDWARD HOWARTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
OLIVE CLARKE OBE DL JP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MARGARET LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.