Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, SOUTHGATE
Charity number: 1131606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CHRICHTON LIMBERT | Chair | 09 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
Patricia Frances Hawkins | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Richard Cook | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Freya Elizabeth Anne Carroll | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Paul Ellerby | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Imogen Frances Cooper | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
GUIYING LI | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Rachel Anne Carroll | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Macrory | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Ms Clare Boulton | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Sandra Anderson | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ANGELA MARY PARKER | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr RONALD LO | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
REV HAZEL MIALL | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr PATRICIA ASHBY | Trustee | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
HILARY JOY MEUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MS JACKIE ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHRISTOPHER EDWARD HOWELL MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CATHERINE GORDON DALLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.