Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT NORTH WEMBLEY

Charity number: 1132919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £140.00k £210.14k £131.40k £265.60k £115.57k
Total expenditure £152.90k £198.08k £123.07k £304.94k £115.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £50.00k £50.00k N/A N/A