Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD WITH ST MARY, SHREWSBURY
Charity number: 1132443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Helen Vout | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Anne Walker | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Vout | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martha McKirdy | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kynaston | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Lapage | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Ian Sawers | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Shirley Hepper | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED VYVYAN BYRD LLEWELLYN BA | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Elizabeth Kelly | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.