Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN, TONBRIDGE
Charity number: 1132563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Naylor | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas James Price | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Thomas | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Stephens | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael James White | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Cathi Joy FREDRICKS | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Wilson | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
GLYNIS MIRIAM HUBBLE | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Howe | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Neal Strawson | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Darrell Anthony Sykes | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Lynn Hams | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
MATTHEW LAKE | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
GABRIEL PIAZZA | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Noble | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Miriam Barker | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Pat Hicks | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
EDITH QUARM WILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
The Rev Canon MARK BARKER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.