FRIENDS OF MYTON POOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1133492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.46k £1.64k £1.81k £1.79k £2.35k
Total expenditure £1.28k £1.65k £990 £2.50k £1.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A