Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST KIRBY

Charity number: 1131379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £256.44k £241.01k £232.18k £184.71k £209.52k
Total expenditure £227.72k £202.37k £303.42k £177.71k £186.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £9.50k £11.07k