Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY SHIREHAMPTON
Charity number: 1131636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alison Sowton | Chair | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Lesley Viney | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Sowton | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Florence Elizabeth Grimes | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
COLIN ROYSTON GODFREY | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE PARRY-REID | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT DAVIDSON | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ALBERT POWELL | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MARTIN CHARLES FOWLER | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR TIM FORDER ALCM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE LORRAINE FORD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.