Financial history RYDE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1133780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £116.02k £130.31k £81.73k £65.94k £41.31k
Total expenditure £127.13k £116.06k £86.10k £109.12k £109.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A