Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE WITH ST MARTIN, ADDISCOMBE
Charity number: 1131721
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev AMANDA SAFFERY JOHNSON | Chair | 01 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Helen Koukoulis | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isabella Lisk | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Rolfe | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Johnston | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nnenna Ugochukwu | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wenton Lespierre | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Ratnaraja | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheba Ebenezer | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Payne | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Barlow | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY DONALD FISHER | Trustee | 02 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
REGINA CHITAMBARA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.