Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF RADIPOLE & MELCOMBE REGIS, WEYMOUTH
Charity number: 1131695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev NICK CLARKE | Chair | 20 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Hilary Bennett | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gaye Elizabeth Bartlett | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Raymond Uden | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Adams | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Joan Hale | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Steeples | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Moore | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mary Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josceline Bailey | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norman Donald White | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie June Collings | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Sloan | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Jo Haine | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Patricia Phillips | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Iona Jennifer McLeod | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jill Miller | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV TOM COOPEY | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neil Lee Biles | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.