Trustees WESLEY CHAPEL (HARROGATE)
Charity number: 1134055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Benjamin Paul Clowes | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Gordon Hay | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Lesley Ann Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
ULRIKE HITCHEN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Greenberg | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
TREVOR DIXON | Trustee | 28 June 2012 |
|
|||||||
Judith Ann Yeats | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JENNIFER GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH SUDRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LESLIE ANDREW SUDRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH BUNTING B ED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PHILIP GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.