Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW'S, WORTHING
Charity number: 1134774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Frank David Taylor | Chair | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon George Rackham | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Santer | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karyn Julie Picker | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bramley | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harold McDonald Mason | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jean Marian Normansell | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Patricia Mason | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Patricia Rackham | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP CHARLES RUGG | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||
JUDITH MARION SLANEY | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE PURSER | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR JAMES PITCHER | Trustee | 29 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA STANDEN | Trustee | 29 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.