Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PLYMSTOCK & HOOE, PLYMOUTH.
Charity number: 1133015
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JENNIE APPLEBY | Chair | 27 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Diana Lorraine Pinkham | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elizabeth Elliot | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Joan Frances Melville Dee | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mary Elizabeth Goulding | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Joanne Parker | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Delia Lorraine Kevern | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anthony Robert Banbury | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Kerry Gilbert | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sheila Eccleston | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Carl James Budden | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Robert Ernest Davidson | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Graham Robert Dee | Trustee | 05 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
MR GRAHAM LEA | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
RICHARD FREDERICK HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.