Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OTTERY ST MARY
Charity number: 1133945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Robert Rix | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Simmonds | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Everett | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Robert Kerr | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Valerie McIntosh | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Ruth Duffy | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Lydia Margaret Sheelagh Cook | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Clayton | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Steve King | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Farley | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rosemary Hall | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Maybery | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
DIANE VERONICA PASSEY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.