Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, NORTON, STOCKTON ON TEES
Charity number: 1131694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martin Anderson | Chair | 08 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev Hannah Richardson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hadyn Beckwith | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth King | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Mansell | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dixon | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Saunders-Littler | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Legg | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Morgan | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Webb | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bostock | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LANGFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.