Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MARKET HARBOROUGH
Charity number: 1133101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Veronica Felicity Gamble | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Kevin John armstrong | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Treanor | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Dangerfield | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Etherington | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Tebbutt | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Giles | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev PEP HILL | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev BARRY LEON HILL | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEIDRE QUINN | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BROOKSTEIN | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MAURICE GRANVILLE SHARP | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA EDITH MARY HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH JAMES HOOK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.