Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GEORGE'S CHURCH, EDGBASTON, BIRMINGHAM
Charity number: 1134777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Butler | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET ELLIS | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sara Jane Clethero | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel James Gibson Phd | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Ypres-Smith | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEITH UFF | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Mertling-Blake | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER UFF | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN COUSE | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS GIBBS | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE J SHAW | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN RODNEY HAYDN PINKESS | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FREDERICK RUSSELL | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Kirby | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|||||
CHARLES WILLIAMS | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.