Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER, FILTON
Charity number: 1131957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIZZIE GREGORY | Chair | 28 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JessicaKathleen Dyke | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Louise Pam | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Gooding | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roy John Hale | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Moller | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faith Tutton BA Hons | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Moller | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Rawlings | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CHAPMAN | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Irene Eade | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Alice Keeble MCMI BSc | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amy Atkinson | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNY CONNOR | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHAPMAN | Trustee | 09 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINDON JOHN WOOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.