Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, CHAPEL ALLERTON
Charity number: 1133806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Powell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Chappell | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Martin | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aljosa Skorja | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev SUSAN RUSHOLME | Trustee | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
FRED ROWLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev David Mark Robinson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JAMES WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRONWEN SARAH ELIZABETH FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NICK SEDDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MALCOLM SLATER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA CHRISTINE ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN BURGON MAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CLIVE GREENWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.