Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDBURGHA YARDLEY
Charity number: 1131907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV WILLIAM JAMES SANDS MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mary Isabelle Bliss | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT THOMSON | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE BRIDGES | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RICHARD DANIELS | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANN BLOOD | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE DAWN HILL | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE NEWMAN | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA CAROLYN HAYES | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT Charles JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
ENID MARGUERITE SEELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HENRY WILLIAM BROCKBANK MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN KENNETH NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN HAVARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON PAUL WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.