Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, COLNEY HEATH
Charity number: 1134735
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheldon Stoutt | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Furlong | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Gibbins | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Martin | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Oliver | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Liz Moore | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline Louise Keightley | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annaleise Claire Hall | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Archer | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Levy | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE PIZAN | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Heather Bennett | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JILL SUTTIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAM FOX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.