Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S BECKENHAM
Charity number: 1133108
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Roger Augustus Wells | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Clarissa Joy Harrington | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Wesley Robert Guy | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Maria Adu | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David John Charlesworth | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Mary Harkness | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Horner | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH ANNE GORDON HOWICK | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Ian Leslie Johnson | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Paul John Lashmar | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anthea Dawn Prendergast | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kearabiloe Tsholofelo Mafohla | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Mark Griffiths | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Butler | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
MR KEITH HOWICK | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.