Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE'S SEVENOAKS WEALD
Charity number: 1133777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV AMANDA HELEN CARR | Chair | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Nick Broadbent Mr | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John Frederick Curtis | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ethelinda Young | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Marian Charlotte Jones | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Paul Royston Goozee | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
lisa Martin | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Ann Miller | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Trevor Tommy Griffiths | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Griffiths | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs Ros Durdant-Hollamby | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Johnson | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR JULIA DOROTHY DOWNING | Trustee | 25 April 2014 |
|
|||||||
SHIRLEY ANN HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.