Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BOTTESFORD WITH ASHBY IN THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN
Charity number: 1133722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kevin Robert Dyke | Chair | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Katja Isabell Mitchell | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Rowland Walker | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Parrott | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Rowbottom | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Stonier OLM | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN SEAN ANDREWS | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|||||
JULIE DYKE | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wishart Ward | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Barbara Kiddle | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Cook | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JULIE BELL | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROL READHEAD | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE TOPLASS | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Henry Galey | Trustee | 24 April 2000 |
|
|||||
LINDON BATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE BODDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHRYN HEWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BODDY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.