Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTHAM
Charity number: 1133811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILBERT CSECS | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
SALLY RICE | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHEA EASTON | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHY ELLIS | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDY MCNEILL | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE IRWIN | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY HOOKWAY | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA KATHERINE BERRY BA FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.