THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, TWICKENHAM

Charity number: 1133089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clarinda Tzu Lam Chan Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
Sheila Preece Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
John Laurence Albasiny Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Sarah Louise Luscombe Waller Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Francis Drasar Trustee 30 April 2017
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF SPECTACLE MAKERS CHARITY Received: On time
THE SPECTACLE MAKERS' CHARITY Recently registered
MRS JUDY BRITTON Trustee 26 April 2015
TWICKENHAM PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS Received: On time
Stephen John Tetley Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Rosemary Deborah Jane Fulljames Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
Karen Kiddle Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Webborn Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
Shobha Sajan Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
ADRIAN MUMFORD MA MMUS Trustee 30 April 2018
THE SIR GEORGE THALBEN-BALL MEMORIAL CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Anne Susan Jane Atlay Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Elizabeth Henley Sledge Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
Audrey Thomas Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Peter Derek Mence Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
Mark Ivan Wilson Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
REV RJ HOPKIN WILLIAMS Chair None on record
Geoffrey Michael Noble Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
BARBARA HELEN ALEXANDRA WILLIAMS Trustee 26 April 2015
TWICKENHAM PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS Received: On time
Sophia Josephine Fisher Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record