Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHURCH HULME
Charity number: 1132587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Canon Robert Ian McLaren | Chair | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN WHISTON | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Louise Webb | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Chettle | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Janvier | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Grace Copley BA | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN STEPHEN HAIGH BA, ARCM | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR JENKINS | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY MACDONALD | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE MARIE WEAVER | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stuart Cotton | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|||||
ALISON DALE | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN FRYER | Trustee | 30 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHARLES RICKARDS | Trustee | 30 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JOAN SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr STEPHEN COLLYER SMITH D PHIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM MATTHEW HALL ACIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA ELIZABETH PULLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.