Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KIRKBY STEPHEN WITH MALLERSTANG, CROSBY GARRETT AND SOULBY
Charity number: 1132029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brendan Anthony Giblin | Chair | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Anthony Cowling Reverend | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Jorysz | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan King MA | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Paisley | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Heath | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GORDON WHITE HUTTON MA | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Edith Elizabeth Polkinhorn | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Scott Coates | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA JANE COWLING | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev CAROLE MARSDEN | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY HAUGHEY | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MILLAR HILL | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANTHONY WHITEHEAD MA FCIH | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY EVELYN TURNER | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev JEAN WRIGHT BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR MARTIN WYATT HOLDGATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENYS MARGARET LUMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CATHY PRIME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN DOROTHY ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR IAN ALLONBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.