Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' STAPLEHURST

Charity number: 1132851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SILKE TETZLAFF Chair 24 November 2011
JOHN SAMUEL NEWLYN
Overdue by 42 days
Joanne Evans Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Samantha Charlotte Christine Heasman Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Simon Evans Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Margaret Ashby Trustee 30 April 2019
STAPLEHURST VILLAGE CENTRE
Overdue by 118 days
Petra Lorraine Ashdown Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Helen Wilkins Trustee 12 May 2018
None on record
Adam Houghton Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
DOREEN JOAN BRAGANZA Trustee 01 November 2013
STAPLEHURST DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES
Received: 8 days late
Valerie Ann Wallis MBE Trustee 01 November 2013
The Social Justice Network
Received: On time
AUDREY BULLOCK Trustee 10 June 2011
None on record