Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD'S WOLLATON
Charity number: 1134834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Barber | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Noreen Louise Thomas | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Ian Smith | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Erica Warde Ella Bailey | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindy Adel Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Elaine Ruth Gibbs also known as Thompson | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Joyce Sutton | Trustee | 29 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Jayne Twissell | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Twissell | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Howes | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Pullen | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bernice Smith | Trustee | 29 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ian Philip Hall | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.