Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, GIPSY HILL
Charity number: 1133804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Carlo Prina | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise MacGregor | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norma Simon | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Williams | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANET BOYCE | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Luke Whiteman | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Kelly | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gareth Moorey | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chibuzor Madu | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicklav Bekoe-Jegede | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emma Lowth | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Klein | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dalton | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Maytom | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Fray | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANNE MITCHENALL | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev JONATHAN EDWARD CROUCHER | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|||||
PAULINE MARJORIE SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL HELEN SKEATH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.