Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LYDGATE, ST ANNE
Charity number: 1132948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Canon Sharon Ann Jones | Chair | 24 July 2016 |
|
|||||
BARBARA ANN HODGSON | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ROBERTS | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Mozdzierz | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Norah Brocklehurst | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arthur John Pearson | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lindsey Coxon | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pat Gillian | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Sue Willett | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Marshall | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr Danos Damianou | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LLOYD | Trustee | 30 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
AL GILLIAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.