Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID'S CHURCH, WILFORD, NOTTINGHAM.
Charity number: 1132451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Jane Paris Baker | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev George White | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Katie White | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Josephine Tatum | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Ann Brown | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sophie Gill Blaken | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Mason | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Ian Baker | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Gary Evans | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Lindsey Elizabeth Barnes | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
WENDY ANN CRANFIELD | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE BEMROSE | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||
IAN DOUGLAS CRANEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EDWARD MASON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PETER LEONARD BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAUL WICKS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.