Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT HORTON, BRADFORD
Charity number: 1133766
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BAVINGTON | Chair | 09 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
Mark King | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sarah Dickson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jeanie Allen | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Louise Bancroft | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Chege | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Enid Rudd | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Camilla Cork | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Ludia Shukai | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Magliore | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Betty Kgetsing-Marshall | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Josie Taylor | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
RACHAEL ARMITAGE | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Gordon Charles Nicholson | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Janet Millar | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN STONE | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Faith Danga | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev ADAM DICKSON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
BERNARD HUGH STERN | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||||
SIMON HENRI DENNIS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
GABRIELLE JOSEPHINE YOUNG MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.