THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER, SELSEY

Charity number: 1134816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keren Belinda Denys Wiseman Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
Margaret Everest Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
MRS P Cooper Trustee 17 April 2016
YOUTH DREAM (SELSEY) LIMITED Received: On time
MARCELLE TURNER Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
JULIA WILKES Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
MICHAEL ROBERT FORMBY Trustee 22 July 2011 None on record
NIGEL PHILIP HOGGARTH Trustee
SELSEY CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
SUSAN LESLEY RIPLEY Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
MARY JANE DAVIES Trustee 25 June 2012 None on record
MARY CRIPPEN Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Colin Francis Rickman Trustee 01 April 2018
SELSEY & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB Received: On time
THE CREMATION SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
SELSEY AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO) Recently registered
SELSEY COMMUNITY FORUM Received: On time
JANET CHRISTINE LANGFORD Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
VERONICA JOAN HOLLOWAY Trustee 25 June 2012 None on record
ANDREW EDWARD WILKES Chair 22 July 2015 None on record
Mrs Rose Flower Trustee 17 March 2013 None on record
Max John Alan Wiseman Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
JOHN DAVID BOLT Trustee 26 June 2013 None on record