Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FULWOOD CHRIST CHURCH, SHEFFIELD
Charity number: 1134057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
35 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan William Dyer | Chair | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rafael Antonio Steffenello De Lima | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert James Mullock | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Irene Holmes | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Willard Thomas Moore | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Vogelberg | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stephen McMinn | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Jean Johnstone | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Houghton | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Heather Wilson | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HELLIWELL TAYLOR | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Marie Olive Meiring | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Clive Richardson | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ruth Edmonds | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Donaldson | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Graham | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kenneth Dodd | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Victoria Glaves | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ware | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian David Harris | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Elizabeth Patterson | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
RONAN JEFFREY WADE | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Paul Nex | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Collier | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Gordon Rae | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Timothy Grant | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|||||
William Ernest Ghinn Thomas | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew James Lawes | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Susannah Linsky | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Davies | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Hewson | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Pete Scamman | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Houghton | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAUL GERMAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.