Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARK, BREDBURY
Charity number: 1132326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martin Makin | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Cope | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sadena Piroozfar | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harry Davies | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naana Kufuor | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hall | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cope | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Owen | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Kanes | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bull | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BROTHERTON | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE WRENN | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bull | Trustee | 05 September 2010 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.