AIR CADETS (WALES AND WEST) WELFARE AND SPORTS FUND

Charity number: 500607
Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £19.54k £9.60k £12.50k £10.45k £13.65k
Total expenditure £17.47k £10.54k £14.32k £5.02k £11.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A