THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PAUL'S, HOOTON

Charity number: 1134654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS J HOWARD Trustee None on record
MRS K HITCHMOUGH Trustee None on record
Julie Bulley Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record
MARY CARMEL EDWARDS Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
Rev KEITH HOWARD Chair
CHILDER THORNTON OLD INFANTS SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
MRS G WALE Trustee None on record
JANET LOUISE BARNETT Trustee
CHILDER THORNTON OLD INFANTS SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
Sarah Jane Wood Trustee 18 April 2016
CHILDER THORNTON OLD INFANTS SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
MRS A HARTLEY Trustee None on record
MR P VAUGHAN Trustee None on record
WALTER BRYAN MCDONALD Trustee None on record
LYNNE JEAN BERGIN Trustee 20 April 2015 None on record
ALEXANDRA LUCILLE DUFFEY Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
WENDY HOLMES Trustee 20 April 2015 None on record
JANET VIVIAN LANGAN Trustee 18 October 2012
CHILDER THORNTON OLD INFANTS SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
MR M HOLMES Trustee None on record
KATIE ANNE LOUISE SYKES Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record
JANE CATHERINE SHEEHY Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
DAVID MALCOLM BUSFIELD Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record