Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHERE
Charity number: 1138039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TIMOTHY DANIEL HEANEY | Chair | 25 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Katharine Mary Denny | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Peter Doherty | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Murray nee Greetham | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Kenneth Lawrence | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Harrison | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANE SARAH BUGLEAR | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANGUS JONATHAN D'ARCY DENNY | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HARRY CROSS | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Leslie Currier | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN O'LOUHGLIN | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVE THURSTON | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNY JANSE | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHY MEAD | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
STUART JOHN MADDEN | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Ian Oakden | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Rev ANDREW MICHAEL PEARSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev SARAH FIELDING HUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN BETTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN TREVOR ASTON MBA FCCA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.