THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, TAUNTON

Charity number: 1134818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET ROSE LAVER Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
STEPHEN FINLAY JENKINS Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
PROF ROGER HUGH TRIGG Trustee 20 May 2017 None on record
Deborah Jayne Whitaker Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Sandra Christine Hall Trustee 21 May 2016 None on record
Nadia Fiona Atherton Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
George William Trevor Staple Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Margaret Jean Allen Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
Claire Louise Mort Trustee 16 May 2015 None on record
NIGEL BIRKETT Trustee None on record
JACK BAYLISS Trustee None on record
Rev Tobias Charles Osmond Chair 14 January 2020
TAUNTON TEAM CHAPLAINCY LIMITED Received: On time
Alan Mansel Ladd Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Cheryl Kathleen Birkett Trustee 01 May 2014 None on record
Rev Louise Ann Bale Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Valerie Jean Gaskell Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
JULIA TRIGG Trustee 22 May 2018 None on record